BERKSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1015269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £571.14k £192.87k £185.96k £173.35k £999.28k
Total expenditure £502.96k £168.15k £132.31k £195.50k £925.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £160.60k N/A N/A N/A £4.70k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £408.78k N/A N/A N/A £990.67k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £1.76k N/A N/A N/A £3.91k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £401.50k N/A N/A N/A £918.87k
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.14k N/A N/A N/A £6.21k
Expenditure - Governance £17.81k N/A N/A N/A £10.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £99.32k N/A N/A N/A £0