DORCHESTER ARTS

Charity number: 1015546
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £242.61k £302.95k £317.67k £399.77k £332.44k
Total expenditure £233.45k £306.78k £280.77k £382.02k £399.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £45.21k £43.20k £44.62k £44.95k £42.45k