DORCHESTER ARTS

Charity number: 1015546

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hanna Trevorrow Trustee 27 February 2020 None on record
Peter John Smith Trustee 31 October 2017 None on record
TREVOR WARE Trustee 15 January 2015
BRIDPORT AREA DEVELOPMENT TRUST Received: On time
Annabel Eigeland Trustee 27 February 2020 None on record
Tess JAMES Trustee 15 January 2015
DORCHESTER OPPORTUNITY PRESCHOOL GROUP LTD Received: On time
THE DORCHESTER CHILD CONTACT CENTRE Received: On time
Jennifer Veale Trustee 31 October 2017 None on record
Penelope Treadwell-Anderson Trustee 02 September 2016 None on record
Louise Sheaves Trustee 27 February 2021 None on record