Friends Of St Andrews CofE Primary Academy (Chardstock)

Charity number: 1015877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £3.83k £4.85k £5.24k £2.32k £725
Total expenditure £9.78k £2.32k £5.70k £5.49k £1.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A