POSITIVE STEPS OLDHAM

Charity number: 1017247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.32m £7.16m £6.73m £6.54m £6.42m
Total expenditure £7.97m £7.40m £7.54m £7.18m £7.11m
Income from government contracts £1.08m £1.08m £4.99m £5.07m £4.73m
Income from government grants £4.66m £4.27m £150.30k £212.97k £354.51k
Income - Donations and legacies £9.76k £15.52k £4.08k £5.07k £11.72k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £157.36k £179.98k £221.53k £317.11k
Income - Charitable activities £7.23m £6.93m £6.45m £6.23m £5.97m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.33k £3.59k £5.38k £13.96k £73.33k
Income - Other £68.66k £53.87k £92.98k £66.99k £48.56k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.97m £7.18m £7.33m £6.89m £6.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £176.73k £208.41k £286.88k £326.07k
Expenditure - Governance £48.34k £44.33k £42.40k £46.33k £30.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0