POSITIVE STEPS OLDHAM

Charity number: 1017247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Muzahid Khan Trustee 06 October 2016
SINGERKACH DEVELOPMENT COMMITTEE Received: On time
OLDHAM CENTRAL MASJID & ISLAMIC CENTRE Received: On time
Hannah Jane Roberts Trustee 11 July 2014 None on record
Julie Anne Edmonson Chair 01 October 2013 None on record
Joanne Marie Taylor Trustee 06 October 2016 None on record
Nicola Jane Robinson Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
Graham Shutleworth Trustee 08 October 2019 None on record
Abdul Malik Trustee 19 December 2018 None on record