Financial history CLASSICAL ROAD SHOW

Charity number: 1017635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £51.98k £43.33k £46.77k £39.26k £39.40k
Total expenditure £59.30k £38.31k £48.34k £35.57k £35.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A