Financial history TYNESIDE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1017704
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £12.34k £12.39k £10.51k £11.79k £6.33k
Total expenditure £10.02k £11.10k £10.49k £8.86k £6.35k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A