Trustees TYNESIDE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1017704
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Fletcher Chair 11 April 2016
None on record
Heather Ging Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Olivia Grant Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Dorothy Gregory Trustee 24 February 2021
HAYS TRAVEL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST GEORGE'S JESMOND
Received: On time
Vivienne Molyneux Trustee 13 April 2017
None on record
Carol Kerr Trustee 13 April 2015
None on record
Margaret Gill Trustee 14 April 2014
None on record
JANE YOUNG Trustee 29 April 2013
None on record
MARION JEAN ANDERSON Trustee
THE ABBEYFIELD NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF LEAZES PARK
Received: On time
ANN KIDMAN Trustee
None on record
ROSALIND ELAINE SHARE Trustee
None on record