Accounts and annual returns EGERTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1017737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 05 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 23 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 21 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 06 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 24 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required