Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF ST JAMES THE GREAT SCHOOL

Charity number: 1017914
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window