Accounts and annual returns WINDMILL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1018154
Charity reporting is overdue by 353 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 353 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 353 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 September 2022 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 October 2020 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 September 2019 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required