Financial history WINDMILL WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1018154
Charity reporting is overdue by 356 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £4.64k £4.07k £3.76k £2.69k £258
Total expenditure £5.02k £4.20k £3.63k £2.75k £488
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A