Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST MARTINS SCHOOL FANGFOSS

Charity number: 1018592
Charity reporting is overdue by 716 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 351 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 351 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 716 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 716 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 March 2022 268 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 January 2020 214 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required