Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MARTINS SCHOOL FANGFOSS

Charity number: 1018592
Charity reporting is overdue by 713 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £3.32k £22.86k £11.78k £9.55k £10.65k
Total expenditure £4.19k £8.74k £14.79k £5.55k £10.35k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A