Financial history STRATFORD PREPARATORY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1018892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £2.67k £2.78k £2.63k £2.21k £107
Total expenditure £2.00k £5.04k £1.36k £1.03k £533
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A