Financial history THE FRIENDS OF WENDENS AMBO CHURCH

Charity number: 1019341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.93k £953 £2.44k £1.09k £2.95k
Total expenditure £1.07k £10.69k £5.26k £73 £895
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A