Accounts and annual returns SHUVO YISROEL
Charity number: 1019437
Charity reporting is overdue by 451 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 86 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 86 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 451 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 451 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 August 2022 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 June 2022 | 496 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 28 April 2022 | 447 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 08 April 2022 | 793 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2019
(These accounts |
05 January 2021 | 335 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window