Accounts and annual returns MERE GREEN 0-5

Charity number: 1019905
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 01 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 December 2021 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 01 December 2021 154 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 11 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window