Financial history THE HOLLAND-ON-SEA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1019949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £39.17k £35.96k £38.26k £39.80k £37.93k
Total expenditure £38.76k £50.14k £39.18k £44.57k £31.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k