CHESHIRE DANCE WORKSHOP LIMITED

Charity number: 1020584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £218.98k £214.90k £218.43k £315.65k £315.96k
Total expenditure £236.24k £177.57k £202.87k £290.50k £319.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £25.88k N/A
Income from government grants £64.61k £54.60k £147.05k £182.39k £230.06k