Trustees INTERNATIONAL SERVICE FELLOWSHIP TRUST
Charity number: 1020758

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jane Methven Howitt | Chair | 03 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alan Butler | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jude Olisa | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Highet Brown | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Keiko Tsunekawa Butterworth | Trustee | 02 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Stewart Ashman | Trustee | 02 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Patricia Ann McConkey | Trustee | 03 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev JOHN PETER SMUTS | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|||||
ONKAR SINGH | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Malcolm Kemp | Trustee | 02 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.