Financial history HODDESDON WOMEN'S CLUB

Charity number: 1020891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.59k £6.88k £6.95k £1.88k £8.36k
Total expenditure £7.03k £6.66k £6.85k £1.87k £2.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A