COUNTESS ANNE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1021864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 January 2020 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 20 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required