COUNTESS ANNE SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1021864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.29k £7.19k £14.90k £10.44k £3.60k
Total expenditure £1.85k £3.43k £8.82k £10.36k £13.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £140 N/A