MUDIAD MEITHRIN

Charity number: 1022320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.75m £5.01m £5.66m £6.62m £6.97m
Total expenditure £6.31m £5.10m £5.64m £6.64m £6.96m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.00m £3.40m £4.02m £4.78m £4.86m
Income - Donations and legacies £5.00k £8.00k £1.00k £0 £92.00k
Income - Other trading activities £1.71m £1.57m £1.64m £1.83m £2.02m
Income - Charitable activities £4.00m £3.40m £4.02m £4.78m £4.86m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.00k £9.00k £1.00k £2.00k £2.00k
Income - Other £22.00k £23.00k £7.00k £4.00k £5.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £92.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.09m £4.95m £5.45m £6.43m £6.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £218.00k £146.00k £194.00k £218.00k £188.00k
Expenditure - Governance £180.00k £103.00k £141.00k £58.00k £77.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £103.00k £86.00k £165.00k £65.00k £216.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0