MUDIAD MEITHRIN

Charity number: 1022320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Rhodri Llwyd Morgan Chair 11 October 2014 None on record
Gari Lewis Trustee 20 April 2016 None on record
Dr Gwennan Schiavone Trustee 01 June 2021 None on record
Dr Catrin Edwards Trustee 01 June 2021 None on record
Anita Evans Trustee 15 October 2014
PWYLLGOR SIR GAERFYRDDIN MUDIAD YSGOLION MEITHRIN Received: On time
RHIANWEN HUWS ROBERTS Trustee None on record
Savanna Jones Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
MAI ROBERTS Trustee None on record
Dr Geraldine Lublin Trustee 01 June 2021
THE SOCIETY FOR LATIN AMERICAN STUDIES Received: On time
Alison Rees-Edwards Trustee 15 October 2015 None on record
Elin Maher Trustee 01 June 2020
MENTER IAITH CASNEWYDD Recently registered
Gwenno George Trustee 01 June 2020 None on record
Huw Marshall Trustee 01 June 2020
COMMUNITY FURNITURE AID Received: On time
Tanio Ltd. Received: On time
CYLCH MEITHRIN BLAENGARW Recently registered
Huw Williams Trustee 15 October 2015
CYLCH CYFANSWADD GRANGETOWN A'R BAE Overdue by 692 days
Corinna Lloyd-Jones Trustee 21 October 2016 None on record
Colin Nosworthy Trustee 01 June 2020 None on record