Financial history HAROLD AND MARJORIE MOSS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1022715
Charity reporting is overdue by 359 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £180.47k £180.06k £184.47k £193.37k £199.19k
Total expenditure £215.25k £181.12k £207.44k £181.42k £244.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A