Accounts and annual returns LLANGWM AND LLANSOY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1023081
Charity reporting is overdue by 225 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 225 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 225 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 March 2021 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 March 2021 504 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required