Financial history LLANGWM AND LLANSOY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1023081
Charity reporting is overdue by 228 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.21k £2.68k £1.74k £1.25k £943
Total expenditure £2.36k £2.49k £1.59k £1.19k £1.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A