ANGMERING GREEN WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1023179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 18 October 2021 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 September 2020 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 07 January 2020 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 17 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 17 June 2018 322 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required