ANGMERING GREEN WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1023179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £9.02k £9.31k £9.93k £8.32k £4.88k
Total expenditure £9.54k £9.22k £10.36k £8.86k £4.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A