Trustees THE CITY HOSPICE TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1023311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maurice Prendergast | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma James | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Thomas | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clifford Jones | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Hill | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Puttock | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Baker | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Dwight | Trustee | 03 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Diana Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr ELINOR KAPP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW JAMES BURNS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.