Financial history NEW LIVING MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1023328
Charity reporting is overdue by 119 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £102.56k £149.96k £128.01k £109.22k £107.61k
Total expenditure £101.65k £66.62k £121.75k £100.29k £105.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A