Financial history THE WORLD ZOROASTRIAN ORGANISATION LTD

Charity number: 1023334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £498.72k £254.41k £521.46k £310.48k £422.34k
Total expenditure £213.02k £169.62k £169.48k £147.97k £84.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £411.75k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £946 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £12.38k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £30.64k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £65.74k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £119.09k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £50.40k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £12.16k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A