Trustees THE WORLD ZOROASTRIAN ORGANISATION LTD

Charity number: 1023334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

25 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pia Sutaria Trustee 18 April 2022
None on record
SHAHIN BEKHRADNIA Trustee 26 September 2021
POURCHISTA FOUNDATION
Overdue by 117 days
THE WORLD ZARATHUSHTRIAN TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Shirin Mehri Trustee 26 September 2021
None on record
Rustam Dubash Trustee 21 February 2021
THE WORLD ZARATHUSHTRIAN TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Darayus Motivala Trustee 21 February 2021
None on record
Rumi Sethna Trustee 07 February 2021
None on record
Tushna Ghadially Trustee 07 December 2020
None on record
Fariborz Rahnamoon Trustee 07 December 2020
None on record
Dr ZENOBIA NADIRSHAW Trustee 26 September 2016
TATA MEDICAL FOUNDATION LTD
Overdue by 382 days
EACH COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT
Received: On time
Maneck Bhujwala Trustee 26 September 2016
None on record
Jimmy Madon Trustee 07 October 2013
None on record
SAM VESUNA Trustee 23 September 2012
None on record
KERSI SHROFF Trustee 03 October 2011
None on record
Kayomarsh Mehta Trustee 28 September 2011
None on record
Dr PARMIS KHATIBI Trustee 30 January 2011
None on record
DARIUS S MISTRY Trustee
None on record
HOMI KHUSROKHAN Trustee
None on record
MEHER AMERSEY Trustee
None on record
DINYAR JAL MODI Trustee
None on record
DADI EDULJI MISTRY Trustee
None on record
BENAFSHA ENGINEER MULLA Trustee
None on record
Dr KERSEY H ANTIA Trustee
None on record
ARMAITY ENGINEER Trustee
None on record
Dr JEHAN BAGLI Trustee
None on record
RUSSI GHADIALI Trustee
None on record