Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST CATHERINES CHURCH
Charity number: 1023600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLEN BOYD BROWN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Degnan Degnan | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Lesley Willis | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Paterson Dr | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Colyer | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PRIM RAYNER | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|||||
EMILY DEGNAN | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE BOWER BOWER | Trustee | 24 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID DEGNAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.