Accounts and annual returns FELLISCLIFFE YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1023603
Charity reporting is overdue by 103 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 103 days
Accounts and TAR 05 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 103 days
Annual return 05 May 2022 21 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 May 2021 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 May 2020 27 October 2021 236 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required