ST MARYS TRUST

Charity number: 1023723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 07 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 November 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required