Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S AND ST PAUL'S CRANFIELD

Charity number: 1023935
Charity reporting is overdue by 535 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 170 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 170 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 535 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 535 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 16 November 2020 285 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required