HORN OF AFRICA REFUGEE WELFARE GROUP

Charity number: 1024194
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 07 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 November 2016 On time Download