WHISTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1024306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £4.04k £10.56k £1.34k £3.93k £4.55k
Total expenditure £4.31k £10.13k £1.59k £4.34k £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A