RIVERHEAD INFANTS SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1024375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £57.87k £33.37k £67.95k £12.09k £20.09k
Total expenditure £53.75k £21.94k £68.65k £13.09k £27.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A