Accounts and annual returns DISCS

Charity number: 1024471
Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 112 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 112 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 January 2024 359 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 27 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 15 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 10 March 2020 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required