Financial history DISCS

Charity number: 1024471
Charity reporting is overdue by 133 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £2.52k £1.05k £750 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.15k £299 £872 £372 £372
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A