Docking Pre-School

Charity number: 1024501
Charity reporting is up to date (118 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £65.54k £91.98k £52.64k £82.02k £80.65k
Total expenditure £57.84k £66.48k £66.74k £74.06k £75.51k
Income from government contracts £52.46k £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £0 £0 N/A N/A