YOUNG FELLOWS ASSOCIATION OF PAKISTAN(Y F A P )UK

Charity number: 1024619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.41k £2.59k £2.23k £641 £2.35k
Total expenditure £8.96k £6.44k £712 £680 £5.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A