Financial history CAMDEN SOMALI CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1024738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £46.67k £20.70k £21.85k £27.86k £7.69k
Total expenditure £50.25k £23.29k £22.07k £21.74k £8.41k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £45.00k £20.00k £20.00k £25.50k N/A