CAMDEN SOMALI CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1024738
Charity reporting is up to date (68 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 April 2021 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 April 2021 68 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 March 2021 403 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 February 2021 742 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 February 2021 1106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 February 2021 1106 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 January 2017 On time Download