SNIBSTON AND DESFORD COLLIERY BANDS COMPRISING THE SNIBSTON AND DESFORD COLLIERY BAND, THE DESFORD COLLIERY BAND AND THE DESFORD ACADEMY

Charity number: 1025068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 February 2018 113 days late Download